CT HB05554 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-22 - File Number 709
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-22 - File Number 709
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Department of Administrative Services to conduct a regional school capacity assessment as part of the application process for school building projects, to authorize regional educational service centers to enter into agreements with school districts to provide administrative services, and to permit school districts to use the aggregate expenditure data of a cooperative arrangement for purposes of reporting requirements.
Title
An Act Concerning Regional Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 83 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | House | File Number 709 |
2016-04-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 482 |
2016-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4225 |
2016-04-12 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-12 | House | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2016-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-05 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2016-03-31 | House | File Number 360 |
2016-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 254 |
2016-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-16 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-03 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |