CT HB05544 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide student fee waivers at public institutions of higher education for veterans who performed service in a time of war and are enrolled at such institution.
Title
An Act Concerning Fee Waivers For Veterans Attending Public Institutions Of Higher Education.
Sponsors
House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Rep. Ronald Napoli [D] | Rep. Michael Digiovancarlo [D] | Rep. Kevin Ryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2021-04-07 | House | File Number 296 |
2021-04-07 | House | House Calendar Number 228 |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-30 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2021-02-23 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |