CT HB05544 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - File Number 593
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - File Number 593
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To enact the Connecticut Sentencing Commission's recommendations with respect to misdemeanor sentences.
Title
An Act Concerning The Recommendations Of The Connecticut Sentencing Commission With Respect To Misdemeanor Sentences.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | House | File Number 593 |
2018-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 394 |
2018-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-04 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/28 |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |