CT HB05542 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To ban the sale or transfer, possession, manufacturing or use of bump stocks or other accessories to increase the rate of fire of a firearm.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Bump Stocks And Other Means Of Enhancing The Rate Of Fire Of A Firearm.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 261 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5530 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 262 PASS (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 146 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 111 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 147 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 72 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 148 APPEAL CHAIR HOUSE AMD C (Y: 78 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 149 AS AMENDED (Y: 114 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-C (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-B (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseSigned by the Governor
2018-05-17HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2018-05-17HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2018-05-15HousePublic Act 18-29
2018-05-08HouseIn Concurrence
2018-05-08HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-08HouseSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 5530
2018-05-08HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-03HouseFile Number 678
2018-05-03HouseSenate Calendar Number 503
2018-05-03HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-05-01HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-01HouseHouse Ruled House Amendment Not Germane, House Amendment Schedule C 4740
2018-05-01HouseHouse Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 4757
2018-05-01HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4707
2018-04-19HouseFile Number 592
2018-04-19HouseHouse Calendar Number 393
2018-04-19HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-19HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-13HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM
2018-04-04HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-03HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-03-19HousePublic Hearing 03/23
2018-03-15HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB05542&which_year=2018
Texthttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2018/TOB/h/2018HB-05542-R00-HB.htm
Texthttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2018/TOB/h/2018HB-05542-R01-HB.htm
Texthttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2018/ACT/pa/2018PA-00029-R00HB-05542-PA.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2018/TS/h/2018HB-05542-R00JUD-CV121-TS.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2018/TS/h/2018HB-05542-R00JUDA-CV122-TS.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2018/TS/h/2018HB-05542-R00JUDB-CV123-TS.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2018/TS/h/2018HB-05542-R00JUDC-CV124-TS.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2018/VOTE/h/2018HV-00149-R00HB05542-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2018/VOTE/h/2018HV-00148-R00HB05542-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2018/VOTE/h/2018HV-00147-R00HB05542-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2018/VOTE/h/2018HV-00146-R00HB05542-HV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2018/VOTE/s/2018SV-00262-R00HB05542-SV.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.cga.ct.gov/2018/VOTE/s/2018SV-00261-R00HB05542-SV.htm

Bill Comments

feedback