CT HB05540 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - File Number 83
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To permit municipalities to establish programs of property tax relief for residents unable to live in their homes due to a natural disaster or an evacuation order or declaration of a state of emergency or disaster.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Municipal Option To Provide Property Tax Relief To Residents Who Are Unable To Live In Their Homes Due To A Natural Disaster Or Evacuation Order.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseFile Number 83
2019-03-21HouseHouse Calendar Number 73
2019-03-21HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-21HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-15HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-08HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-08HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-01HousePublic Hearing 03/06
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
2019-02-20HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-01-30HouseVote to Draft
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback