CT HB05538 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - File Number 335
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - File Number 335
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To permit retired public safety personnel to receive retirement allowances if such personnel are employed by a local or regional board of education in a public safety capacity after retirement.
Title
An Act Concerning The Continuation Of Retirement Allowances For Certain Retirees Upon Subsequent Employment By A Board Of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | File Number 335 |
2019-04-03 | House | House Calendar Number 213 |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2019-02-20 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |