CT HB05538 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - File Number 590
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To allow an option for a life-time ammunition permit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning A Nonexpiring Ammunition Certificate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19HouseFile Number 590
2018-04-19HouseHouse Calendar Number 391
2018-04-19HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-19HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-13HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM
2018-04-04HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-03HouseJoint Favorable
2018-03-19HousePublic Hearing 03/23
2018-03-15HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback