CT HB05533 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To extend the time in which certain funds are deemed escheated to the state from three years to seven years.
Title
An Act Concerning The Time Period For Funds To Escheat To The State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2016-04-12 | House | File Number 584 |
2016-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 358 |
2016-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-30 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |