CT HB05533 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-04 - File Number 638
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-04 - File Number 638
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify provisions concerning the filling of a vacancy for certain town offices and concerning minority representation on boards, commissions, committees or bodies.
Title
An Act Concerning Vacancies In Certain Town Offices And Minority Representation.
Sponsors
Rep. William Aman [R] | House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. Marie Kirkley-Bey [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 208 AS AMENDED (Y: 120 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-04 | File Number 638 | |
2012-05-04 | Senate Calendar Number 481 | |
2012-05-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-05-03 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |
2012-05-03 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-03 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4565 | |
2012-04-17 | File Number 495 | |
2012-04-17 | House Calendar Number 371 | |
2012-04-17 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-17 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-10 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-30 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-29 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-03-16 | Public Hearing 03/21 | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |