CT HB05530 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require that access to the state-wide centralized voter registration system at election day registration locations is only through a router owned by the state and issued for such purpose.
Title
An Act Concerning Election Day Registration Locations And Access To The State-wide Centralized Voter Registration System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2017-03-23 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2017-01-27 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |