CT HB05526 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To permit an officer or a person who serves process to receive a reasonable sum for recording a notice of lis pendens in the office of a town clerk.
Title
An Act Concerning The Payment Of A Reasonable Fee To An Officer Or Person Who Records A Document In The Office Of A Town Clerk And Service Of Process Of A Wage Execution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 313 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 317 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House Roll Call Vote 90 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 317 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - House Roll Call Vote 90 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-16 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-16 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-11 | House | Public Act 16-64 |
2016-05-03 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-03 | House | Senate Passed |
2016-04-25 | House | Senate Calendar Number 502 |
2016-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-21 | House | House Passed |
2016-04-14 | House | File Number 609 |
2016-04-14 | House | House Calendar Number 377 |
2016-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-30 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-03 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |