CT HB05524 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Senate Calendar Number 603
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Senate Calendar Number 603
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To amend the definition of "narcotic substance" to add fentanyl and fentanyl derivatives in order to increase penalties for dealing such substances.
Title
An Act Increasing Penalties For Dealing Synthetic Drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 258 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Calendar Number 603 |
2016-05-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-05-03 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2016-05-03 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2016-05-03 | House | House Passed |
2016-04-14 | House | File Number 608 |
2016-04-14 | House | House Calendar Number 376 |
2016-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-30 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-03 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |