CT HB05515 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To permit a zoning commission to regulate the brightness and illumination of advertising signs and billboards.
Title
An Act Concerning The Authority Of A Zoning Commission To Regulate The Brightness And Illumination Of Advertising Signs And Billboards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 282 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 168 AS AMENDED (Y: 129 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 168 AS AMENDED (Y: 129 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Public Act 18-28 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-03 | Senate | File Number 681 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 501 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2018-05-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4914 |
2018-04-25 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-25 | House | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2018-04-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development |
2018-04-16 | House | File Number 501 |
2018-04-16 | House | House Calendar Number 344 |
2018-04-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 10:00 AM |
2018-04-03 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-15 | House | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |