CT HB05513 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Calendar Number 509
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Calendar Number 509
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure the enforcement of choice of law provisions contained in certain contracts, agreements or undertakings.
Title
An Act Concerning Choice Of Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 210 (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 509 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | House Passed |
2018-04-18 | House | File Number 568 |
2018-04-18 | House | House Calendar Number 380 |
2018-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-03 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-15 | House | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |