CT HB05510 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To prepare electric distribution companies, municipalities, public and private merchants and electrical contractors for the presence and operation of electric, zero-emission and fuel cell vehicles in the state, to make changes regarding parking of hydrogen fuel vehicles under grade level and to make changes regarding labeling of vehicles that carry pressurized gas as fuel.
Title
An Act Concerning Electric And Fuel Cell Electric Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 409 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 377 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 413 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 381 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 110 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 377 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 413 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 381 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House Roll Call Vote 110 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-19 | House | Public Act 16-135 |
2016-05-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-04 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-27 | House | File Number 745 |
2016-04-27 | House | Senate Calendar Number 527 |
2016-04-27 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-25 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-25 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4522 |
2016-04-21 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-21 | House | No New File by Committee on Transportation |
2016-04-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-21 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Transportation |
2016-04-11 | House | File Number 567 |
2016-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 350 |
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |