CT HB05507 | 2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To exempt individuals, sole proprietors and business partners who have no employees from the Labor Department's requirements that each business owner periodically certify the number of employees that such owner currently employs for the purposes of chapter 567 of the general statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Labor Department And The Certification Of Employees For Purposes Of The Unemployment Compensation System.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-08HouseReferred by House to Committee on Appropriations
2016-03-29HouseFile Number 247
2016-03-29HouseHouse Calendar Number 190
2016-03-29HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2016-03-29HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-03-21HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 10:00 AM
2016-03-15HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-03-10HouseJoint Favorable
2016-03-04HousePublic Hearing 03/08
2016-03-01HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback