CT HB05507 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-20 - Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-20 - Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To eliminate the requirement that electric distribution companies maintain a referral service or offer to send bills for competitive electric suppliers and to amend definitions and statutes related to electric suppliers, aggregators and brokers.
Title
An Act Concerning Consumer Protections In The Retail Electricity Market.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-12 | File Number 444 | |
2010-04-12 | House Calendar Number 266 | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-12 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-05 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 10:00 AM | |
2010-03-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-23 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-12 | Public Hearing 03/16 | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |