CT HB05501 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Suspending Certain Gas Taxes And Sales And Use Taxes On Certain Clothing And Allocating Funds For Free Public Bus Services.
Title
An Act Suspending Certain Gas Taxes And Sales And Use Taxes On Certain Clothing And Allocating Funds For Free Public Bus Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - House Roll Call Vote 30 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 73 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 73 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Special Act 22-2 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Governor |
2022-03-23 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 3965 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | House Passed |
2022-03-22 | House | Emergency Certification |