CT HB05498 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-04 - Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-04 - Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prevent educational institutions that require students to waive certain rights from receiving public funds or licensure or accreditation from the Office of Higher Education.
Title
An Act Making Certain Educational Institutions Ineligible For Public Funds And Licensure Or Accreditation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 219 AS AMENDED (Y: 118 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2018-05-04 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-04 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5224 |
2018-04-18 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-18 | House | No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2018-04-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-17 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2018-04-05 | House | File Number 263 |
2018-04-05 | House | House Calendar Number 196 |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-13 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |