CT HB05498 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Public Hearing 02/03
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Public Hearing 02/03
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify the oversight responsibilities of the West Rock Ridge state park advisory council.
Title
An Act Concerning Submission Of Certain Development And Maintenance Plans To The West Rock Ridge State Park Advisory Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-23 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | House | Public Hearing 02/03 |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2017-01-26 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-01-23 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |