CT HB05498 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To have legislative committees of the General Assembly hold agencies responsible for the periodic review of their regulations.
Title
An Act Revising The Regulation Review Process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 317 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 321 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 149 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 321 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 149 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Public Act 16-58 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-28 | Senate | File Number 753 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 530 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2016-04-27 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-27 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4477 |
2016-04-06 | House | File Number 491 |
2016-04-06 | House | House Calendar Number 312 |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-31 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-03 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |