CT HB05497 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - File Number 490
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - File Number 490
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the posting of a publicly accessible list of all boards, commissions or councils that have legislative appointments.
Title
An Act Requiring A Publicly Accessible List Of Legislatively Appointed Boards, Commissions And Councils.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | House | File Number 490 |
2016-04-06 | House | House Calendar Number 311 |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-31 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-21 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-03 | House | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |