CT HB05497 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - File Number 673
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - File Number 673
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To expand the integrated basic education and skills training programming implemented at Eastern Connecticut State University to Central Connecticut State University, Southern Connecticut State University and Western Connecticut State University.
Title
An Act Implementing An I-best Program On A Regional Basis.
Sponsors
House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Rep. Christopher Perone [D] | Rep. Emil Altobello [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | House | File Number 673 |
2014-04-24 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-24 | House | New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-17 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/14 5:00 PM |
2014-04-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-15 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-01 | House | File Number 263 |
2014-04-01 | House | House Calendar Number 170 |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-13 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |