CT HB05495 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To reinstate the Legislative Program Review and Investigations Committee, require prequalification applicants to disclose certain adverse administrative proceedings and to require purchases of real property by The University of Connecticut to obtain the approval of the State Properties Review Board, Attorney General and Office of Policy and Management.
Title
An Act Reestablishing The Legislative Program Review And Investigations Committee And Concerning State Contractor Prequalification And Real Estate Acquisitions Of The University Of Connecticut.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] | Rep. Mary Mushinsky [D] | Rep. Patrick Boyd [D] |
Rep. Christine Pavalock-D'Amato [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-14 | House | File Number 504 |
2022-04-14 | House | House Calendar Number 359 |
2022-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-21 | House | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |