CT HB05492 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - File Number 503
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - File Number 503
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To modify the process of public health and civil preparedness emergency declarations, including by requiring legislative approval for renewal declarations issued one hundred eighty days or more after the initial declaration, permitting the legislative disapproval of executive orders issued one hundred eighty days or more after the initial declaration and permitting the legislative disapproval of any declaration of civil preparedness emergency regardless of cause.
Title
An Act Concerning The Process For Public Health And Civil Preparedness Emergency Declarations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | House | File Number 503 |
2022-04-14 | House | House Calendar Number 358 |
2022-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-21 | House | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |