CT HB05485 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To make various revisions to the public health statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Various Revisions To The Public Health Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 316 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 184 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 184 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act 22-92 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 552 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2022-05-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-02 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6272 |
2022-04-12 | House | File Number 423 |
2022-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 302 |
2022-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-05 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-17 | House | Public Hearing 03/21 |
2022-03-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |