CT HB05485 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Referred by House to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Referred by House to Committee on Transportation
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To: Define and regulate electric bicycles; permit vehicles to turn left at a red signal under certain circumstances; permit municipal parking authorities to create or establish commuter lot networks, transit systems, bicycle share systems and motor vehicle share systems; permit traffic authorities to post certain signage; and lower the threshold to block re-registration of a passenger motor vehicle due to unpaid parking violations.
Title
An Act Concerning Electric Bicycles, Traffic Control And Parking And Traffic Authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Transportation |
2018-04-12 | House | File Number 451 |
2018-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 322 |
2018-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-06 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-26 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-15 | House | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |