CT HB05484 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-18 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-18 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) require water quality testing of private or semipublic wells prior to the sale, exchange, purchase or transfer of real property and reporting of such test results to the local health authority and Department of Public Health, (2) eliminate arsenic and uranium from the list of contaminants for which a local director of health may require a private well or semipublic well be tested, and (3) require water quality testing for newly constructed private and semipublic wells.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Public Health's Recommendations Regarding Private And Semipublic Well Testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-18 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-18 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-13 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-07 | House | File Number 375 |
2022-04-07 | House | House Calendar Number 266 |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-23 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-17 | House | Public Hearing 03/21 |
2022-03-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |