CT HB05484 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To enable municipalities that have blighted areas and municipalities that would benefit from the renovation, rehabilitation or construction of commercial or residential properties to make findings to that end for the purpose of adopting resolutions under the Connecticut City and Town Development Act, and to eliminate the requirement that such resolutions be approved by referenda.
Title
An Act Concerning The Connecticut City And Town Development Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 412 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 416 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 166 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 416 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 166 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Public Act 16-133 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 544 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2016-04-28 | House | House Passed |
2016-03-30 | House | File Number 287 |
2016-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 228 |
2016-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-29 | House | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2016-02-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |