CT HB05482 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - File Number 197
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - File Number 197
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the working group on a public-private partnership to recruit businesses to the state.
Title
An Act Implementing The Recommendations Of The Working Group On A Public-private Partnership To Recruit Businesses To Connecticut.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | File Number 197 |
2021-03-30 | House | House Calendar Number 168 |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-17 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-16 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-05 | House | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |
2021-02-25 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-04 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |