CT HB05479 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require local and regional boards of education to maintain healthy indoor air quality in their schools.
Title
An Act Concerning Indoor Air Quality In Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-25 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-11 | House | File Number 395 |
2022-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 285 |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-28 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-25 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-17 | House | Public Hearing 03/21 |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |