CT HB05478 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 603
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 603
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a property tax exemption of ten per cent of the assessed value of primary residences owned and occupied by certain veterans and to provide for reimbursement to municipalities and districts with an equalized net grand list per capita below a certain threshold.
Title
An Act Concerning A Property Tax Exemption For Certain Veterans And The Provision Of Written Notice To Municipalities And Veterans' Organizations Of Certain Optional Municipal Property Tax Exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | File Number 603 |
2022-04-25 | House | House Calendar Number 466 |
2022-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 12:00 PM |
2022-04-07 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-06 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-16 | House | Public Hearing 03/21 |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |