CT HB05464 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-02 - House Recommitted to Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-02 - House Recommitted to Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To clarify the value of the homestead exemption as set forth in section 52-352b of the general statutes, as amended by public act 21-161.
Title
An Act Concerning The Value Of The Homestead Exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | House | House Recommitted to Judiciary |
2022-05-02 | House | Bill Passed Temporarily |
2022-04-20 | House | File Number 552 |
2022-04-20 | House | House Calendar Number 402 |
2022-04-20 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-20 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-13 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/22 5:00 PM |
2022-04-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-04 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2022-03-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |