CT HB05463 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - File Number 675
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - File Number 675
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a Medicaid public option in which persons not otherwise eligible for Medicaid can buy coverage.
Title
An Act Concerning The Study Of Health Insurance Options For Individuals Ineligible For Medicaid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 142 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 98 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 143 AS AMENDED (Y: 93 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 143 AS AMENDED (Y: 93 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | File Number 675 |
2018-05-03 | House | Senate Calendar Number 499 |
2018-05-03 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-01 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-01 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3982 |
2018-04-04 | House | File Number 202 |
2018-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 161 |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-28 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-15 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2018-03-09 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |