CT HB05462 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require transition services for special education students who are fourteen to twenty-two years of age and to provide a written bill of rights to parents of special education students at an initial planning and placement team meeting.
Title
An Act Concerning Transition Services For Special Education Students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-04 | House | File Number 201 |
2018-04-04 | House | House Calendar Number 160 |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-09 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |