CT HB05461 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Public Hearing 03/17
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Public Hearing 03/17
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To statutorily confer jurisdiction over contested elections for state legislative offices to the judicial branch.
Title
An Act Concerning Jurisdiction Over Disputes In Elections For The Offices Of State Senator And State Representative.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | House | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2021-03-10 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |