CT HB05460 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide greater transparency when increasing railroad fare.
Title
An Act Requiring Legislative Approval Before The Department Of Transportation Increases Railroad Fares.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |
2019-03-15 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-08 | House | Public Hearing 02/13 |
2019-02-07 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |