CT HB05460 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To remove the requirement that a qualified school employee voluntarily agrees to administer glucagon to a student with diabetes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Administration Of Glucagon In Schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Education |
2016-03-22 | House | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education |
2016-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Education |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
Connecticut State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HB05460&which_year=2016 |
Text | http://www.cga.ct.gov/2016/TOB/h/2016HB-05460-R00-HB.htm |