CT HB05460 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - Senate Calendar Number 501
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - Senate Calendar Number 501
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit an employer from coercing employees into attending or participating in meetings sponsored by the employer concerning the employer's views on religious or political matters.
Title
An Act Concerning Captive Audience Meetings.
Sponsors
Rep. Minnie Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Gregory Haddad [D] | Rep. Ernest Hewett [D] | House Labor and Public Employees Committee |
Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Rep. Peter Tercyak [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 98 (Y: 77 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 97 LCO # 5898 (Y: 49 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2011-05-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 96 LCO # 5892 (Y: 49 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - House Roll Call Vote 95 LCO # 6207 (Y: 49 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - House Roll Call Vote 94 APPEAL CHAIR (Y: 89 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - House Roll Call Vote 93 LCO # 5891 (Y: 50 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - House Roll Call Vote 92 APPEAL CHAIR (Y: 86 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - House Roll Call Vote 91 APPEAL CHAIR (Y: 90 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 97 LCO # 5898 (Y: 49 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2011-05-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 96 LCO # 5892 (Y: 49 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - House Roll Call Vote 95 LCO # 6207 (Y: 49 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - House Roll Call Vote 94 APPEAL CHAIR (Y: 89 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - House Roll Call Vote 93 LCO # 5891 (Y: 50 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - House Roll Call Vote 92 APPEAL CHAIR (Y: 86 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House - House Roll Call Vote 91 APPEAL CHAIR (Y: 90 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | Senate Calendar Number 501 | |
2011-05-13 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-11 | House Passed | |
2011-05-11 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule G 5898 | |
2011-05-11 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule F 5892 | |
2011-05-11 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule E 6207 | |
2011-05-11 | House Ruled House Amendment Not Germane, House Amendment Schedule D 6153 | |
2011-05-11 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 5891 | |
2011-05-11 | House Ruled House Amendment Not Germane, House Amendment Schedule B 6169 | |
2011-05-11 | House Ruled House Amendment Not Germane, House Amendment Schedule A 6155 | |
2011-04-29 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-29 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-29 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-29 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-28 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-21 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-28 | File Number 235 | |
2011-03-28 | House Calendar Number 146 | |
2011-03-28 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-03-28 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-15 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-02-02 | Public Hearing 02/10 | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |