CT HB05453 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require liability coverage policies for underground storage tanks to renew at the end of the term for such policy if the insured is in good standing and has timely paid the premiums for such policy.
Title
An Act Concerning The Renewal Of Liability Insurance Policies For Underground Storage Tanks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 321 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 172 (Y: 137 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 172 (Y: 137 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Public Act 18-118 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 487 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2018-05-02 | House | House Passed |
2018-04-11 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-11 | House | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2018-04-11 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2018-04-05 | House | File Number 258 |
2018-04-05 | House | House Calendar Number 191 |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-29 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-09 | House | Public Hearing 03/16 |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |