CT HB05452 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Senate Calendar Number 483
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Senate Calendar Number 483
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) require express written authorization from committee treasurers for campaign expenditures, (2) provide alternate disclaimer requirements for text or media message political advertising, (3) allow legislative caucus and leadership committees to transfer money between themselves with approval of their respective treasurers, and (4) require the State Elections Enforcement Commission to adjust Citizens' Election Program contribution limit and qualifying threshold amounts by January first of the relevant years.
Title
An Act Concerning Various Campaign Finance Reforms.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] | Sen. Robert Sampson [R] | Rep. Martin Foncello [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 199 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 483 |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2024-05-07 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B |
2024-05-07 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 5996 |
2024-05-07 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5980 |
2024-04-15 | House | File Number 489 |
2024-04-15 | House | House Calendar Number 339 |
2024-04-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-26 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-08 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |