CT HB05451 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - File Number 583
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - File Number 583
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To modify the procurement process for payroll deduction slots, to remove the prohibition against a retired municipal employee earning retirement credit when employed by a nonparticipating municipality while receiving retirement benefits and to repeal requirements for a biennial report concerning CORE-CT and a report regarding labor management savings for each fiscal year.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To Statutes Concerning The Comptroller.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - House - House Roll Call Vote 54 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | File Number 583 |
2022-04-21 | House | Senate Calendar Number 417 |
2022-04-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-19 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-19 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4863 |
2022-04-13 | House | File Number 460 |
2022-04-13 | House | House Calendar Number 340 |
2022-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-14 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2022-03-11 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |