CT HB05450 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make revisions to the statutes concerning the palliative use of marijuana.
Title
An Act Concerning The Palliative Use Of Marijuana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 261 ADOPT SENATE AMD I LCO 5463 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 260 ADOPT SENATE AMD H LCO 5551 (Y: 10 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 259 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 5500 (Y: 11 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 258 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5448 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 266 PASS (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 265 ADOPT SENATE AMD I LCO 5463 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 264 ADOPT SENATE AMD H LCO 5551 (Y: 10 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 263 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 5500 (Y: 11 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 262 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5448 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 84 AS AMENDED (Y: 129 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 260 ADOPT SENATE AMD H LCO 5551 (Y: 10 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 259 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 5500 (Y: 11 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 258 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5448 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 266 PASS (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 265 ADOPT SENATE AMD I LCO 5463 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 264 ADOPT SENATE AMD H LCO 5551 (Y: 10 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 263 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 5500 (Y: 11 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 262 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5448 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 84 AS AMENDED (Y: 129 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Public Act 16-23 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule I 5463 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule H 5551 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule G 5480 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule F 5486 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 5498 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 5497 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 5544 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 5500 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 5448 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-21 | Senate | File Number 700 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 447 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-20 | House | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule C 4348 |
2016-04-20 | House | Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule B 4425 |
2016-04-20 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4338 |
2016-04-19 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-19 | House | No New File by Committee on General Law |
2016-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-12 | House | Referred by House to Committee on General Law |
2016-04-06 | House | File Number 486 |
2016-04-06 | House | House Calendar Number 307 |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-06 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-31 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-21 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |