CT HB05446 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide municipalities with the discretion to exempt certain mass gatherings from statutory licensure requirements.
Title
An Act Concerning Mass Gatherings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 341 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-05-18 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-13 | Public Act 10-92 | |
2010-05-04 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-04-28 | File Number 661 | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Calendar Number 492 | |
2010-04-28 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-27 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate | |
2010-04-27 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-04-27 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4333 | |
2010-04-14 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-14 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |
2010-04-14 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-14 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-14 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-13 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | |
2010-04-06 | File Number 329 | |
2010-04-06 | House Calendar Number 185 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-04-06 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 10:00 AM | |
2010-03-22 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-19 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-08 | Public Hearing 03/12 | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |