CT HB05443 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Department of Economic and Community Development to study the needs of manufacturers in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning A State Marketing Strategy By The Department Of Economic And Community Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-10 | House | File Number 374 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 248 |
2018-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-03 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-27 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-27 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-15 | House | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |