CT HB05442 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To study the effects on certain businesses that had their experience rate increase despite the passage of public act 21-5.
Title
An Act Concerning Unemployment Compensation Experience Rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 369 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 236 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 236 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Special Act 22-13 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 572 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2022-05-04 | House | House Passed |
2022-03-31 | House | File Number 234 |
2022-03-31 | House | House Calendar Number 199 |
2022-03-31 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-11 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |