CT HB05435 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To repeal provisions in existing law providing consumers certain options to purchase above ground propane tanks.
Title
An Act Concerning Consumers And Propane Fuel Providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 327 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 331 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 198 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 331 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 198 AS AMENDED (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-18 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-18 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-13 | House | Public Act 16-69 |
2016-05-03 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-03 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-03 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-30 | House | Senate Calendar Number 571 |
2016-04-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-30 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2016-04-30 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-30 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5671 |
2016-03-24 | House | File Number 194 |
2016-03-24 | House | House Calendar Number 159 |
2016-03-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-11 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-26 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |