CT HB05434 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-08 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-08 - Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require health insurance coverage for the cost of a custody evaluation for an individual under eighteen years of age that is ordered by a court.
Title
An Act Requiring Health Insurance Coverage For A Court-ordered Custody Evaluation For A Minor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-04-01 | House | File Number 355 |
2015-04-01 | House | House Calendar Number 212 |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-17 | House | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing 02/17 |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2015-01-29 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2015-01-20 | House | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |