CT HB05434 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - File Number 483
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - File Number 483
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To: (1) Provide that a claimant in a medical malpractice action establish the negligence of a health care provider by clear and convincing evidence; and (2) provide that health care providers who render care in emergency departments of acute care hospitals and licensed medical professionals who render emergency care voluntarily and gratuitously be liable for acts or omissions constituting a reckless disregard for the consequences.
Title
An Act Concerning The Professional Standard Of Care For Emergency Medical Care Providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | File Number 483 | |
2012-04-17 | House Calendar Number 360 | |
2012-04-17 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-17 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-10 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-30 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-30 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-12 | Public Hearing 03/16 | |
2012-03-06 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |