CT HB05433 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make minor and technical changes to the tax and related statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Minor And Technical Changes To The Tax And Related Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 283 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 207 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 207 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Public Act 18-26 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 504 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | House Passed |
2018-04-23 | House | File Number 640 |
2018-04-23 | House | House Calendar Number 420 |
2018-04-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/18 10:00 AM |
2018-04-06 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-12 | House | Public Hearing 03/16 |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |